Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Adolfo Marinelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

Titular Bishop of Soli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1812¹Born
14 Jan 185341.0AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
6 Mar 185341.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
9 Dec 185543.9ResignedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
13 Jun 185644.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Soli
5 Feb 187462.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccola Adolfo Marinelli
Bishop Niccola Adolfo Marinelli (born 1812, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santorini {Thira}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSyros

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 498, and Page 524
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast