Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hanna Paulus Marcus

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zaku (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1910BornChioz
15 May 193727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
13 Oct 197363.4AppointedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
16 Dec 197363.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
29 Nov 198373.5ResignedBishop of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq
13 Jul 198575.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Zaku (Chaldean), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Hanna Paulus Marcus:
Bishop Hanna Paulus Marcus (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zaku

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,396
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013