Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marianus Maravich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1645AppointedBishop of Duvno, Bosnia and Herzegovina
10 Dec 1645Ordained BishopBishop of Duvno, Bosnia and Herzegovina
24 Jul 1647AppointedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
14 Sep 1660DiedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Marianus Maravich
Bishop Marianus Maravich O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte Clarie, Ragusa, Archdiocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 119, and Page 178
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 49
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast