Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Manzador, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1706³BornVienna, Austria
10 Dec 172418.7ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
23 Jan 172922.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
12 Mar 172923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
13 Mar 176458.0SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
26 Nov 176458.7ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
3 Feb 176558.8Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
3 Oct 177266.5SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
15 Mar 177367.0ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
28 Aug 177468.4DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pio Manzador:
Bishop Pio Manzador B. (born , died ) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 372, and Page 413
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 1 Dec 2015