Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignaz Koller

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1725BornVienna, Austria
13 Oct 174823.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 176035.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary
15 Dec 176035.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Targa
22 Jan 176135.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Targa
10 Aug 176236.9SucceededBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
4 Apr 177347.5DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ignaz Koller:
Bishop Ignaz Koller (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

  • a priest for 24.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013