Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Józef Manastyrski

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1803BornStanisławów
22 Aug 182623.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Aug 182623.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 186359.6SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
28 Sep 186360.2ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
8 Nov 186360.4Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
17 Dec 186966.5DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Józef Manastyrski:
Bishop Antoni Józef Manastyrski (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 469
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 1 Jul 2015