Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Antonio Maiorsini

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1812Born
20 Dec 183422.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 185442.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lacedonia, Italy
30 Nov 185442.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
17 Dec 185442.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
31 May 185947.3SelectedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
20 Jun 185947.4ConfirmedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
27 Oct 187159.7AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
23 Nov 189381.8DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Maiorsini
Archbishop Francesco Antonio Maiorsini (born , died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel Sant' Agata
Ordained BishopSs. Jean et Paul, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 92, and Page 301
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,854, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast