Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe del Prete Belmonte

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thyatira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1815BornVenafro
21 Sep 183924.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 185540.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
10 Oct 188873.3DiedTitular Bishop of Thyatira

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe del Prete Belmonte:
Bishop Giuseppe del Prete Belmonte (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Thyatira

  • a priest for 49.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 552

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013