Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Maguire, O.F.M. Rec. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1761³Born
12 Jan 181957.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland
12 Jan 181957.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia
25 Apr 181957.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia
25 Apr 182664.8DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Maguire
Bishop Patrick Maguire O.F.M. Rec. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrumlish, Co. Longford
Ordained BishopChapel, Cavan

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 228, and Page 350
  • b/c2?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 23
  • bd/d: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 82
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 23 Sep 2020

Quantcast