Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Maginn

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Derry, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1802Born
Jun 1825²22.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Sep 184542.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Derry, Ireland
30 Sep 184542.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
18 Jan 184643.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
17 Jan 184946.0DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Maginn (VIAF: 21785846)
Bishop Edward Maginn (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFintona

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 175, and Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,846, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast