Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo di Porzia

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1559¹Born
1592²33.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gratz
7 Aug 159839.5AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
9 Aug 159839.6Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
4 Nov 160647.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Gratz
23 Aug 161253.6DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo di Porzia (VIAF: 62478615)
Bishop Girolamo di Porzia (born 1559, died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 281
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast