Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Joseph Wandt

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1780³BornDingelstädt
7 Mar 180524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
9 Dec 184161.3SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
23 May 184261.8ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
14 Aug 184262.0Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
16 Oct 184969.2DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jakob Joseph Wandt:
Bishop Jakob Joseph Wandt (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013