Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godehard Joseph Osthaus

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1768BornHildesheim
18 Dec 179628.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hildesheim, Germany
16 Jun 179729.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
26 Mar 182961.1SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
27 Jul 182961.4ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
4 Oct 182961.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
30 Dec 183567.8DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Godehard Joseph Osthaus:
Bishop Godehard Joseph Osthaus (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013