Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcelo Lopez de Azcona

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Dec 1651SelectedArchbishop of México, Federal District
29 Apr 1652ConfirmedArchbishop of México, Federal District
25 Jul 1653Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
10 Nov 1654DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Lopez de Azcona:
Archbishop Marcelo Lopez de Azcona (died ) Archbishop of México

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,427
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,842
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 182, Number 1,138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013