Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Garcilaso de la Vega

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Oct 1651AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
7 Sep 1653Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
5 May 1654DiedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Juan Garcilaso de la Vega
Bishop Juan Garcilaso de la Vega (died ) Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,428
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 199
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 182, Number 1,134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast