Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Josaphat Li Hongguang] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1926Born
21 Mar 195326.6Ordained PriestPriest
1996²69.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China
14 May 199669.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China
16 Jul 200680.0SucceededBishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China
13 Dec 200680.4DiedBishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josaphat Li Hongguang
Bishop Josaphat Li Hongguang (born , died ) Bishop of Xinjiang [Kiangchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuiancheng village outside Lucheng/Lu’ an
Ordained BishopXinjiangxian

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast