Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Leoni

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Mar 1578AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
4 May 1578Ordained BishopBishop of Ferrara, Italy
7 Aug 1590DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Leoni (VIAF: 64353330)
Bishop Paolo Leoni (died ) Bishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria degli Angeli, Church, Ferrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 6,293
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 196
  • b/c2+: CB, 28 Oct 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast