Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Lei Chang-hsia (Lei Zhen-xia)

Deceased

Bishop of Fenyang [Fenyang]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1915BornHoh-Ch'u
15 Jan 193923.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 194933.7AppointedBishop of Fenyang [Fenyang], China
14 Aug 194933.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fenyang [Fenyang], China
16 Feb 197054.3DiedBishop of Fenyang [Fenyang], China

MicroData Summary for Simon Lei Chang-hsia (Lei Zhen-xia):
Bishop Simon Lei Chang-hsia (Lei Zhen-xia) (born , died ) Bishop of Fenyang [Fenyang]

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013