Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomaz Franciszek Czapski, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1688³BornMarienburg
170112.8ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
17 Nov 172436.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Jul 172638.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Jul 172638.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
6 Dec 173042.7SucceededBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
5 Jan 173142.8InstalledBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
23 Apr 173345.1DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomaz Franciszek Czapski:
Bishop Thomaz Franciszek Czapski O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 178, and Page 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015