Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stephen Cardinal Langton

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1150¹Born
1205²55.0Elevated to Cardinal
1205²55.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
Jun 1207³57.4AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
17 Jun 120757.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
9 Jul 122878.5DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephen Langton (VIAF: 7385506)
Stephen Cardinal Langton (born 1150, died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLangton near Spilsby, Lincolnshire

  • a bishop for 21.0 years
  • a cardinal for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 54
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 11
  • b: CB, 13 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast