Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedict of Sansetun

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Dec 1214AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
22 Feb 1215Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 1226DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Benedict of Sansetun
Bishop Benedict of Sansetun (died ) Bishop of Rochester

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 54
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 560

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016