Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John of Fountains, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Dec 1219AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
8 Mar 1220Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
6 May 1225DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John of Fountains
Bishop John of Fountains O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 55
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 328
  • ocist: CB, 20 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016