Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard le Poor

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England


Events

DateEventTitle
Jan 1215³AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
25 Jan 1215Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
9 May 1217AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
22 Jul 1228AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
15 Apr 1237DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard le Poor:
Bishop Richard le Poor (died ) Bishop of Durham

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 54
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 595
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 239
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013