Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William of Goldclive, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Llandaff, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1219AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
27 Oct 1219Ordained BishopBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
28 Jan 1230DiedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William of Goldclive
Bishop William of Goldclive O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Llandaff

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 55
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 242
  • osb: CB, 20 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016