Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Foliot

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jul 1219AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
27 Oct 1219Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
26 Jul 1234DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh Foliot
Bishop Hugh Foliot (died ) Bishop of Hereford

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 55
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 458

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018