Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lothar von Kübel

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Freiburg im Breisgau

Titular Bishop of Leuce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1823BornSinzheim
19 Aug 184724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
20 Dec 186744.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
20 Dec 186744.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
22 Mar 186844.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
5 Jan 186945.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
3 Aug 188158.3DiedApostolic Administrator of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Lothar von Kübel:
Archbishop Lothar von Kübel (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 341

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013