Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Keane

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1871Born
23 Jun 189524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
29 Dec 192352.8AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
2 Mar 192453.0Ordained BishopBishop of Limerick, Ireland
13 Mar 194574.0DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

MicroData Summary for David Keane
Bishop David Keane (born , died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallygran

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast