Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Astuni

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1830Born
10 Jun 185423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
21 Jan 190372.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
22 Feb 190372.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
21 Feb 191180.3DiedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Astuni
Bishop Giuseppe Astuni (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 305
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,642
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast