Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Clément Jeanbart

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1943 Born
15 Apr 196825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
2 Aug 199552.4AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
16 Sep 199552.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
6 May 201774.1AppointedAdministrator of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Jun 201774.3CeasedAdministrator of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Jean-Clément Jeanbart
Archbishop Jean-Clément Jeanbart (born ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep, Archdiocese of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek)
Ordained BishopSaint-Paul, Basilica, Harissa, Lebanon

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,610
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2017
  • c1: CB, 12 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jul 2017