Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Réginald-André-Paulin-Edmond Jacq, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lang Són et Cao Bang

Titular Bishop of Cerasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1905BornSèvres, France
22 Jul 193428.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Jul 194842.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam
8 Jul 194842.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cerasa
30 Nov 194843.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cerasa
4 May 196054.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam
24 Nov 196055.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam
2 May 200195.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Réginald-André-Paulin-Edmond Jacq:
Bishop Réginald-André-Paulin-Edmond Jacq O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Lang Són et Cao Bang

  • a priest for 66.7 years
  • a bishop for 52.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015