Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Hedde, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Lang Són et Cao Bang

Titular Bishop of Echinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1879BornBrest, France
24 May 190223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Jun 192950.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam
20 Nov 193152.6AppointedPrefect of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam
11 Jul 193960.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
11 Jul 193960.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam
30 Nov 193960.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Echinus
4 May 196081.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Lang Són et Cao Bang, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Félix Hedde:
Bishop Félix Hedde O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Lang Són et Cao Bang

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013