Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ignacio Iñigo Angulo

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1736BornVillasuso
25 Sep 179862.3AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
30 Dec 179862.6Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
8 Jan 179962.6DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ignacio Iñigo Angulo
Bishop Francisco Ignacio Iñigo Angulo (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for -.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 46
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016