Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Incisa Beccaria

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1726BornSan Stefano del Belbo
20 Dec 174922.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 176437.3SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
9 Jul 176437.5ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
19 Aug 176437.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
17 Jun 177245.4SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
7 Sep 177245.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
12 Oct 178255.7DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Incisa Beccaria:
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Incisa Beccaria (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 76, and Page 422

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015