Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Arras Minutili

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1717³BornNuoro
2 Dec 177861.1SelectedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
1 Mar 177961.3ConfirmedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
18 Apr 177961.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
Mar 1784³66.3DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Arras Minutili:
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Arras Minutili (born , died Mar 1784) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1783
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015