Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Carta

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1697³BornSilanus
1721¹23.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 176467.3SelectedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
26 Nov 176467.7ConfirmedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
17 Feb 176567.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
Jan 1771³73.8DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Carta:
Bishop Pietro Paolo Carta (born ) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Oct 2013