Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Stoffels (Christophori)

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornAntwerpen
24 Jan 159924.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 162247.6AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
25 May 162348.3Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
6 Jul 162954.5DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis Stoffels (Christophori):
Bishop Denis Stoffels (Christophori) (died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015