Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Stanislaus Han Daoyi] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1920²Born
1947²27.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 199373.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China
27 Oct 200080.8DiedBishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanislaus Han Daoyi
Bishop Stanislaus Han Daoyi (born 1920, died ) Bishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPeking

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 8 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast