Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cyrille Emmanuel Benni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mossul (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1921BornBagdad
2 Jul 194423.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 195938.8SelectedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
23 Oct 195938.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
8 Dec 195938.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
23 Jun 199675.5RetiredArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
9 Dec 199978.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Cyrille Emmanuel Benni:
Archbishop Cyrille Emmanuel Benni (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mossul

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 103
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013