Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace Denis Ephrem Rahmani (Rahamani)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1848BornMossul
12 Apr 187324.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 188739.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne dei Siri
20 Sep 189041.9AppointedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
1 May 189445.6AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Syrian), Syria
9 Oct 189850.0SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
9 Oct 189850.0SelectedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
28 Nov 189850.1ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
28 Nov 189850.1ConfirmedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Syrian), Lebanon
7 May 192980.6DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Ignace Denis Ephrem Rahmani (Rahamani):
Patriarch Ignace Denis Ephrem Rahmani (Rahamani) (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 109
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 20 Oct 2014