Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal de Guise de Lorraine

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1525Born
6 Feb 153812.9AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
8 Feb 154519.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reims, France
27 Jul 154722.4Elevated to Cardinal
4 Nov 154722.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
16 Nov 154722.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Metz, France
18 May 155025.2SucceededBishop of Metz, France
22 Apr 155126.1ResignedBishop of Metz, France
11 Dec 155530.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare
25 Dec 157449.8DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Guise de Lorraine (VIAF: 46904834)
Charles Cardinal de Guise de Lorraine (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoinville
Ordained BishopJoinville
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
  • a cardinal for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1547
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast