Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristóbal Rojas Sandoval

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1502Born
8 Oct 154644.2AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
4 May 155653.8AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
27 May 156259.9AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
18 May 157168.8AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
22 Sep 158078.2DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Rojas Sandoval (VIAF: 21147919)
Archbishop Cristóbal Rojas Sandoval (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuenterrabía, Diocese of Pamplona
Death PlaceCigalles, Diocese of Palencia

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 59, Number 327
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 265, and Page 211
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1546, Number 26*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast