Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop García de Santa María Mendoza y Zúñiga, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Dec 1600SelectedArchbishop of México, Federal District
12 Feb 1601ConfirmedArchbishop of México, Federal District
15 Aug 1601Ordained BishopArchbishop of México, Federal District
5 Oct 1606DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for García de Santa María Mendoza y Zúñiga:
Archbishop García de Santa María Mendoza y Zúñiga O.S.H. (died ) Archbishop of México

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 243
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 116, Number 736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 240
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015