Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Anselmo Gualtieri

Deceased

Bishop of Todi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1665¹BornFirman
11 Apr 170540.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 170843.2AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
3 Jun 170843.4Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
21 Jan 171550.1AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
15 Jul 174681.5DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Anselmo Gualtieri:
Bishop Ludovico Anselmo Gualtieri (died ) Bishop of Todi

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 394, and Page 412
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,688

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013