Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pepin de Rosa, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
18 Mar 156262.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium
18 Mar 156262.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Selymbria
1 Nov 156262.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selymbria
7 Aug 156969.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pepin de Rosa
Bishop Pepin de Rosa O.P. (born 1500, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mechelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLanden
Ordained BishopS. Sacrement chapel, Sainte Gudule, Bruxelles
Death PlaceMalines, Archdiocese of Mechelen

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast