Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Damasi Van der Linden (Lindanus)

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1523¹Born
8 Aug 156138.6AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
4 Apr 156340.2Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
12 Feb 158865.1AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
22 Jun 158865.4InstalledBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
2 Nov 158865.8DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Damasi Van der Linden (Lindanus) (VIAF: 2791850)
Bishop Guillaume Damasi Van der Linden (Lindanus) (born 1523, died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDordrecht
Ordained BishopSte Gudule, Bruxelles

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 201, and Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1563, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast