Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Swithin Thomas Alexander Wijetunge Goonewardena, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anuradhapura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1925BornDehiwela
16 Mar 195125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 Dec 197550.4AppointedPrefect of Anuradhapura, Sri Lanka
18 Mar 198256.6AppointedBishop of Anuradhapura, Sri Lanka
10 Jul 198256.9Ordained BishopBishop of Anuradhapura, Sri Lanka
2 Nov 199570.2ResignedBishop of Anuradhapura, Sri Lanka
17 Apr 200074.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Anuradhapura, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Henry Swithin Thomas Alexander Wijetunge Goonewardena:
Bishop Henry Swithin Thomas Alexander Wijetunge Goonewardena O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Anuradhapura

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015