Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Llamas Rivas, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1659¹BornAntequera, Spain
13 Jun 171455.4AppointedBishop of Panamá
4 Nov 171455.8Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
1 Apr 171960.2DiedBishop of Panamá

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Llamas Rivas:
Bishop Juan José Llamas Rivas O. Carm. (born 1659, died ) Bishop of Panamá

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 305
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 31, Number 88
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015