Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Gómez de Salazar

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1743Born
29 Mar 180258.5AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
23 May 180258.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
3 Nov 181572.1DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Gómez de Salazar
Bishop Manuel Gómez de Salazar (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan de la Encinilla

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 26
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 55
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 121, Number 642

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast