Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Decius Giustiniani, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580²Born
27 Feb 161232.2AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
18 Mar 161232.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
21 Nov 164262.9DiedBishop of Aleria, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Decius Giustiniani:
Bishop Decius Giustiniani O.P. (died ) Bishop of Aleria

  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 76
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 52, Number 288
  • b/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013