Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Gera

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1613AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
30 Nov 1613Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
21 May 1625AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
23 Nov 1643DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente Gera:
Bishop Clemente Gera (died ) Bishop of Lodi

  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 216, and Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013